Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Sponsored by
Delegate Johnson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education and nonpublic schools that hold a certificate of approval from the State Board and participate in the Nonpublic Schools Textbook and Technology Grants Program to develop and implement a program of age-appropriate education on the awareness and prevention of sexual abuse and assault that includes, for students in grades 6 through 8, material promoting the awareness and prevention of human and sex trafficking.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0138 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/06/2021
Legislative Date
10/06/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/06/2021 10/06/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page