Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an official publisher that publishes legal material in an electronic record to designate the electronic record as official, under specified circumstances, and authenticate the electronic record in a specified manner; providing that specified legal material in an electronic record is presumed to be an accurate copy; requiring an official publisher of specified legal material in an electronic record to provide for the preservation and security of the record and to ensure that it is reasonably available to the public; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0137
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0162 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Text - Chapter - State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
(   10-1601 through 10-1611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page