Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to reduce greenhouse gas emissions through various measures, including altering statewide greenhouse gas emissions reduction requirements so that after 2040 statewide greenhouse gas emissions are net negative; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt a plan for the reduction of greenhouse gas emissions by December 31, 2022; establishing a Climate Crisis Council to develop a plan to meet the reduction targets set out in the Act; establishing a greenhouse gas pollution fee on certain fuels; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0135
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Climate Crisis and Environmental Justice Act
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Last Updated: 3/14/2022 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page