Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the 9-1-1 Registry Program to authorize self-advocates, parents, or guardians of individuals with autism or other special needs to register with the 9-1-1 system in order to alert first responders of certain behaviors individuals with autism or other special needs may exhibit during encounters with first responders; and requiring each public safety answering point to establish certain procedures, ensure the details of Program are publicly available, and maintain accurate information on registered individuals.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/01/2021
Legislative Date
9/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/01/2021 9/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Text - First - 9-1-1 Registry Program - Autism and Other Special Needs - Established
(   1-304.4 )
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 5:05 PM
Click to return on the top page