Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Extending from September 30, 2022, to September 30, 2027, the termination date of the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact and other provisions of law related to the Compact; and requiring the State Board of Physicians to include an update on the status of the Compact in its 2023 annual report.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2021
Legislative Date
9/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/23/2021 9/23/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 9:30 AM
Click to return on the top page