Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain certification agency, by December 1, 2022 and annually thereafter, to compile and manage a certain list of certified LGBTQ businesses in the State to identify and encourage outreach to LGBTQ businesses and track the use of certified LGBTQ businesses on State procurement contracts; authorizing the certification agency, in compiling the list, to use certain existing lists; and requiring the certification agency to publish the list on its website.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2021
Legislative Date
10/31/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2021 10/31/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/12/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page