Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Minor Victim
Sponsored by
Delegate Pippy
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalties for the crime of visual surveillance with prurient intent if the victim was a minor at the time of the offense and the offender is at least 4 years older than the victim; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment of up to 10 years or a fine of $5,000 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0326
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Minor Victim
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Minor Victim
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 10:48 AM
Click to return on the top page