Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Eastern Shore Code Counties - Maximum Hotel Rental Tax Rate - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegate Hartman
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 5% to 6%, the maximum hotel rental tax rate that counties in the Eastern Shore class of code counties may impose.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0095
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0931 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/17/2023
Legislative Date
10/17/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-13)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-4)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/17/2023 10/17/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Eastern Shore Code Counties - Maximum Hotel Rental Tax Rate - Alteration
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Eastern Shore Code Counties - Maximum Hotel Rental Tax Rate - Alteration
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (116-13) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (31-4) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 9:10 AM
Click to return on the top page