Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a register of wills is not required to record or provide certain documents until the appropriate fee for the documents has been paid; altering certain probate fees on estates that are valued at a certain amount; requiring a register of wills to collect and assess certain fees at a certain time; authorizing registers of wills to provide certain services and charge certain fees for those services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0766 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/14/2022 9:18 AM
Click to return on the top page