Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
No–Knock Warrants – Elimination (Duncan’s Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law authorizing an application for a search warrant to contain a request authorizing the executing law enforcement officer to enter a building, apartment, premises, place, or thing to be searched without giving notice of the officer's authority or purpose under certain circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2020
Legislative Date
9/18/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - No–Knock Warrants – Elimination (Duncan’s Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2020 9/18/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - No–Knock Warrants – Elimination (Duncan’s Act)
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page