Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin and Atterbeary
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions relating to immunity from criminal arrest, charge, or prosecution for a person experiencing a medical emergency after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs or assisting someone experiencing a certain medical emergency.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0212 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 3:30 p.m.
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 9:35 PM
Click to return on the top page