Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - In-Person Voting - Proof of Identity
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an election judge to establish a voter's identity by requiring the voter to present a valid government-issued photo identification or a valid nongovernment-issued photo identification, and a current bill, statement, or check that states the voter's name and address as proof of identity; requiring a voter to vote a provisional ballot if the voter is unable to provide certain proof of identity; and prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully voting or attempting to vote under a false form of identification.
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0035 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2023
Legislative Date
10/30/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Elections - In-Person Voting - Proof of Identity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2023 10/30/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Elections - In-Person Voting - Proof of Identity
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/15/2024 8:49 AM
Click to return on the top page