Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee and Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an individual from the requirement to not be subject to compulsory school attendance and to have withdrawn from school in order to be eligible to obtain a high school diploma by examination if the individual participates in a GED Option Program administered by the State Department of Education that creates a pathway to a high school diploma by examination for certain currently enrolled high school English language learner students under the age of 21 years.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0043
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Text - First - High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text - Chapter - High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page