Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsored by
Wicomico County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-BB (bed and breakfast) beer and wine license in Wicomico County; providing the qualifications that must be met for issuance of the license; authorizing the license holder to sell alcoholic beverages to guests of the establishment for on-premises consumption Monday through Sunday, from 7 a.m. to midnight; authorizing the license holder to sell alcoholic beverages to guests of certain catered events under certain circumstances; providing an annual license fee of $300; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0019
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Text - Chapter - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
(   32-1001, 32-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page