Original
Chamber
1stChamber
Reading
placeholder
placeholder
Referralplaceholder
to Cmte
placeholder
placeholder
2ndplaceholder
Reading
placeholder
placeholder
3rdplaceholder
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1stChamber
Reading
placeholder
placeholder
Referralplaceholder
to Cmte
placeholder
placeholder
2ndplaceholder
Reading
placeholder
placeholder
3rdplaceholder
Reading
placeholder
placeholder
Review inplaceholder
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. CmteChambers
(if necessary)
placeholder
placeholder
To Governor
placeholder
- Title
- Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024)
- Sponsored by
- The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
- Status
- In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
- Analysis
Synopsis
Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State Budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.
Committees
- Original:
- Appropriations
- Opposite:
- Budget and Taxation
Details
History
Toggle History Dropdown
Legislation History |
---|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Chamber | Calendar Date | Legislative Date | Action | Proceedings |
---|---|---|---|---|
House | 1/20/2023 | 1/20/2023 | First Reading Appropriations | |
Text - First - Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024) | ||||
Report - House - Committee Report - Appropriations | ||||
Reprint - House - Committee Reprint - Appropriations | ||||
Report - House - Summary Report - Appropriations | ||||
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations | Click to view Recorded Media | |||
House | 3/13/2023 | 3/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
House | 3/13/2023 | 3/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments | 41AClick to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/13/2023 | 3/04/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted | 41AClick to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#1-8) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#9-17) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#9) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#10) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#11) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#12-17) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#18-28) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#29-59) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#60-70) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#71-88) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#89-104) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#105-127) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#105-106) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#107) Adopted (99-33) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Committee Amendment (#108-127) Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Adopted | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {603028/1 (Delegate Munoz) Rejected (43-89) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {973121/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (42-90) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {283325/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (37-92) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {883425/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (36-94) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {303728/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (35-95) | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
House | 3/16/2023 | 3/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | 44 Click to view Recorded Media |
Text - Third - Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2024) | ||||
House | 3/17/2023 | 3/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (131-5) | 46 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/17/2023 | 3/10/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | 47 Click to view Recorded Media |
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation | Click to view Recorded Media | |||
Senate | 3/20/2023 | 3/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
Report - Senate - Committee Report - Budget and Taxation | ||||
Reprint - Senate - Committee Reprint - Budget and Taxation | ||||
Report - Senate - Summary Report - Budget and Taxation | ||||
Senate | 3/20/2023 | 3/12/2023 | Favorable with Amendments | 49 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/20/2023 | 3/12/2023 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted | 49 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/20/2023 | 3/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments | 50 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/20/2023 | 3/13/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted | 50 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Committee Amendment (#1-6) Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Committee Amendment (#7-11) Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Committee Amendment (#12-20) Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Committee Amendment (#21-26) Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Committee Amendment (#27-32) Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Committee Amendment (#33-38) Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Floor Committee Amendment {983729/1 Adopted | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Floor Amendment {783822/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (14-33) | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Floor Amendment {783020/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-33) | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/22/2023 | 3/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | 51 Click to view Recorded Media |
Senate | 3/23/2023 | 3/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | 52 Click to view Recorded Media |
File Code
Toggle Filecode Dropdown
Subjects
Toggle Subjects Dropdown
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/27/2023 8:33 AM