Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2023
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain required appropriation to the Revenue Stabilization Account; reducing the budgeted Medicaid Deficit Assessment for fiscal year 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0183
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843125/1
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {923020/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (36-99)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {483322/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (38-98)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2023
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-24)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463726/1
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463726/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {463526/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2023
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Favorable with Amendments {843125/1 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Favorable with Amendments {843125/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Floor Amendment {923020/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (36-99) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Floor Amendment {483322/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (38-98) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2023
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Third Reading Passed (111-24) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Favorable with Amendments {463726/1 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments {463726/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2023 3/14/2023 Favorable with Amendments {463726/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2023 3/14/2023 Floor Amendment {463526/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2023 3/14/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2011, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020 )
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 11:43 AM
Click to return on the top page