Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to receive and process complaints involving alleged violations of certain air and water quality requirements in a certain manner; requiring the Department to keep an electronic record of certain complaints for 10 years; requiring the Department Natural Resources to report, on or before September 30 each year, to the Governor and the General Assembly certain information relating to the enforcement of natural resources and conservation laws; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0324
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {450214/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {793629/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (40-91)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {623029/1 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {123322/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (42-5)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {450214/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {793629/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (40-91) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {623029/1 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Floor Amendment {123322/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (42-5) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Text - Chapter - Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
(   1-305 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page