Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing and establishing the methodology used to calculate the weekly benefit amount; altering the taxable wage base used to determine employer contributions to the Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund, the dependent allowance, and the amount of earned wages subtracted from a weekly benefit amount; requiring the Secretary of Labor to set the taxable wage base and the maximum weekly benefit amount in a certain manner beginning in calendar year 2027 and each calendar year thereafter; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0104
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025, July 1, 2026
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/03/2023
Legislative Date
10/03/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/03/2023 10/03/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
House 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:50 PM
Click to return on the top page