Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Sponsored by
Delegate Attar
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding the crime of knowingly being a participant in a straw purchase of a regulated firearm to the list of crimes subject to warrantless arrest; and providing a penalty on conviction of imprisonment not to exceed 10 years or a fine of up to $25,000 or both.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0669 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Firearms - Straw Purchase Participant Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Firearms - Straw Purchase Participant Penalty
House 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {333629/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 1:20 PM
Click to return on the top page