Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government – School Construction – Permits
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Aumann, Barron, Brooks, Cluster, Ebersole, Folden, Grammer, Hettleman, Impallaria, Kipke, Lafferty, Lam, Luedtke, Metzgar, Miele, Morhaim, Stein, Tarlau, West, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each county or municipality, to the extent practicable, to expedite the process for the application and issuance of a permit related to or required for the construction of public or private school facilities.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government – School Construction – Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784469/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government – School Construction – Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Government – School Construction – Permits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Government – School Construction – Permits
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {784469/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government – School Construction – Permits
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text - Chapter - Local Government – School Construction – Permits
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page