Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Major Information Technology Development Projects
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "information technology" and "major information technology development project" for the purpose of certain provisions of law governing information processing and security; requiring a unit of State government to submit certain information to the Secretary of Information Technology relating to a major information technology development project; altering certain responsibilities of the Secretary relating to major information technology development projects; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0294
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2023
Legislative Date
9/15/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2023 9/15/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Information Technology - Major Information Technology Development Projects
House 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments {593223/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Information Technology - Major Information Technology Development Projects
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2024 2/06/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/13/2024 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page