Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Gold Star and Next of Kin Families
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Veterans Affairs) and Delegates Allen, Baker, Boyce, Foley, Guyton, Holmes, Jacobs, Lehman, J. Long, Love, T. Morgan, Nawrocki, Ruth, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, and Ziegler
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the recipient of a U.S. Department of Defense Next of Kin lapel button to apply for special registration plates; and waiving the initial vehicle registration fee associated with special registration plates issued to the recipient of a Gold Star or a Next of Kin lapel button.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0275
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2023
Legislative Date
9/18/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2023 9/18/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Gold Star and Next of Kin Families
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {743228/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Gold Star and Next of Kin Families
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page