Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, K. Kelly, and Myers
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the maximum speed limit on Interstate 68 may be up to 70 miles an hour.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0158
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0593 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
(   21-801.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page