Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Bagnall, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Feldmark, Foley, Forbes, Guyton, Hill, Jackson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Krimm, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Qi, Ruth, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Williams, Amprey, Barve, Boyce, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Prettyman, Stein, Terrasa
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to conduct an infrastructure review of each pedestrian or bicyclist fatality that occurs on a State highway or at an intersection of a State highway and another highway or a municipal street to identify certain deficiencies and identify appropriate corrective actions; and requiring the Administration to complete the review within 6 months after being notified by law enforcement of a pedestrian or bicyclist fatality and publish the review on its website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0874
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693829/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-4) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text - Chapter - State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
(   8-204.2 )
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page