Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Carey, Charkoudian, Hill, Jackson, Lehman, R. Lewis, Qi, Rogers, Watson, and Grammer
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Regulating the use of biometric data by private entities, including by requiring certain private entities in possession of biometric data to develop a written policy, made available to the public, establishing a retention schedule and guidelines for permanent destruction of biometric data; authorizing an individual alleging a violation of the Act to bring a civil action against the offending private entity; and making a violation of the Act an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0335
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0218 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {143528/1 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {393823/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (33-94)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {623528/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (35-93)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-30)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453726/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Grammer) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Floor Amendment {143528/1 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Floor Amendment {393823/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (33-94) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Floor Amendment {623528/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (35-93) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Third Reading Passed (100-30) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-301,   13-408,   14-4401 through 14-4406 )
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page