Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum period of imprisonment for a first conviction for manslaughter by vehicle or vessel from 10 years to 20 years and for a second or subsequent conviction, or having been previously convicted for certain other crimes, from 15 years to 30 years.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0026
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Manslaughter by Vehicle or Vessel - Increased Penalties (Jamari's Law)
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:52 PM
Click to return on the top page