Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Intercepted Communications - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Simpson, Addison, Bartlett, Crutchfield, Phillips, Solomon, and Taylor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reclassifying, as a misdemeanor instead of a felony, a certain offense relating to the prohibition against intercepting and disclosing any wire, oral, or electronic communications.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0362 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Intercepted Communications - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2024
Legislative Date
1/16/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Intercepted Communications - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Intercepted Communications - Penalty
House 1/16/2024 1/16/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Intercepted Communications - Penalty
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:52 PM
Click to return on the top page