Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Anderson, Glenn, and McIntosh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Police Department of Baltimore City is an agency and instrumentality of the City of Baltimore, instead of the State; and providing that police officers of the department have the authority conferred under a certain provision of law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
(   16-2, 16-3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page