Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or a municipality to establish a certain fund for the purpose of providing support for the repair of infrastructure in a community subject to a condominium association or a homeowners association; and requiring that certain property tax revenues be assigned to a fund created under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0446
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0055 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-25)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (112-25) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2024 2/11/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2024 8:06 AM
Click to return on the top page