Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of Name
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone and Kittleman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the name of the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund to the State Judiciary Technology Fund.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of Name
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of Name
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-601, 13-602, 13-603, 7-102, 7-202, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page