Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Identifying Suitable Property
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Housing and Community Development identify certain property as suitable for use or redevelopment; prohibiting the Department from identifying certain property for use or redevelopment as affordable housing; and requiring the Department to consider certain factors when identifying whether a property is suitable for use or redevelopment as affordable housing.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0333
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-33)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Identifying Suitable Property
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Identifying Suitable Property
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (105-33) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2024 2/11/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/19/2024 8:06 AM
Click to return on the top page