Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Anderson, Jacobs, Metzgar, Miele, Angel, Hayes, Hill, McDonough, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified prohibitions on participation in procurement apply only for a specified period of time following the issuance of an invitation for bids or a request for proposals; providing that specified prohibitions on participation in procurement do not apply to a subsequent invitation for bids or request for proposals for which the specifications are reused under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0109
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {616585/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {616585/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page