Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Jones, Barve, Boyce, Ciliberti, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Prettyman, Ruth, Stein, Terrasa, Wells, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a school bus be routed with the intent that the number of pupils on the bus does not exceed the manufacturer's rated seating capacity for the bus; and requiring that, if an emergency or a temporary situation causes the number of pupils to exceed the rated seating capacity, the situation be corrected within a reasonable period of time.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0087 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453521/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/23/2022 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page