Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes, Boafo, Fennell, and Taylor
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Moving from October 31, 2023, to October 31, 2024, the deadline for the reporting requirement for the Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity; and extending from June 30, 2024, to December 31, 2024, the termination date for the Task Force.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0518
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1097 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-7)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-7) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page