Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Holmes, and J. Long
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering procedures for the dispute settlement mechanism under the Maryland Cooperative Housing Corporation Act; applying the dispute settlement mechanism established by the Act to apply to any complaint or demand formally arising on or after October 1, 2023, with a certain exception; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0015
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0462 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {243723/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2024 2/15/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page