Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Property Taxes – Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to set special property tax rates, under certain circumstances, for any class or subclass of real property that is subject to the county property tax; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1320 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – Property Taxes – Authority to Set Special Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City – Property Taxes – Authority to Set Special Rates
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/9/2022 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page