Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Former Members - Member Contributions
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain rate of interest on certain former member contributions in the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit of the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2022
Legislative Date
1/30/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Former Members - Member Contributions
House 1/30/2022 1/30/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/19/2022 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page