Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a common ownership community to develop a smoking policy if the property subject to the control of the governing body is a multifamily dwelling.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1295 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/02/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/02/2023
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
House 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2023 2/02/2023 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2023 2/02/2023 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   14-134 )
Last Updated: 2/2/2023 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page