Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain maximum penalty amounts the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights is authorized to seek if it finds that a respondent has engaged in a discriminatory act regarding public accommodations and certain actions by persons licensed or regulated by a unit in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation do not apply if the discriminatory act is committed by the agent or employee of the respondent; requiring any civil penalties collected under the Act be paid to the complainant, not the General Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0271
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0935 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {526081/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {643228/1 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {873220/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-95)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {526081/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {643228/1 (Delegate Adams) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {873220/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-95) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   20-1016, 20-304, 20-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page