Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Complaints - Forwarding to State's Attorney
Sponsored by
Delegate Attar
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exception to the requirement that a complaint that alleges the commission of an act by a child that would be a felony if committed by an adult must be forwarded to the State's Attorney under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Complaints - Forwarding to State's Attorney
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Complaints - Forwarding to State's Attorney
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/9/2024 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page