Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting up to $500 in certain accounts of a judgment debtor from execution on the judgment without an election by the debtor to exempt the money; establishing a $6,000 limit on the cumulative value of property and cash that may be exempted; requiring a writ of garnishment issued for certain accounts to instruct the garnishee that it is to garnish only a certain amount; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0772 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-32)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (101-32) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/23/2022 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page