Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Cardin, and Kaufman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is considered a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for certain communications; establishing certain standards and requirements relating to a motion to dismiss an alleged SLAPP suit; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0568
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0129 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/9/2024 12:39 PM
Click to return on the top page