Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates White, Pena-Melnyk, Acevero, Allen, Alston, Amprey, D. Barnes, Boyce, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Conaway, Crosby, Crutchfield, Davis, Ebersole, Edelson, Fair, Feldmark, Fennell, Forbes, Grossman, Guzzone, Harris, Henson, Jackson, A. Johnson, A. Jones, D. Jones, Kaiser, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, J. Long, Love, McCaskill, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Ruth, Simpson, Taylor, Terrasa, Toles, Turner, Vogel, Wells, Wilkins, Williams, Woods, Young, and Ziegler
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Extending the time for the submission of the final report of the Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission to December 1, 2024; and extending the termination date for the Commission to June 30, 2025.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
House 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2019, 2021 )
Last Updated: 1/26/2023 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page