Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public School Athletics - Basketball Schedule
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Bridges, Edelson, Embry, Kaufman, Lehman, McCaskill, Phillips, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing rules for public school athletic schedules for basketball, including the maximum number of games played per week and season and the number of tournament games played each year; requiring each county board of education to decide whether to authorize a team to play in a tournament or showcase game; and prohibiting a student from being disciplined for not participating in a game or practice that occurs outside of the school year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1429 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Public School Athletics - Basketball Schedule
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453927/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Public School Athletics - Basketball Schedule
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/16/2023
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Public School Athletics - Basketball Schedule
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable with Amendments {453927/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Public School Athletics - Basketball Schedule
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/16/2023 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-118 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 10:31 AM
Click to return on the top page