Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Bus Stops – Monitoring Cameras and Safety Measures
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Charkoudian, Palakovich Carr, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency, under certain cirucumstances, to issue a warning rather than a citation for a failure to stop for a school vehicle that is recorded by a school bus monitoring camera; and requiring the State Highway Administration to develop a certain plan for improved safety measures at certain school bus stops in Montgomery County and to report its findings on or before December 31, 2024.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0406
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0849 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - School Bus Stops – Monitoring Cameras and Safety Measures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - School Bus Stops – Monitoring Cameras and Safety Measures
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/8/2024 5:01 PM
Click to return on the top page