Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages License Fees - Underage Drinking
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law requiring the County Commissioners of Carroll County to pay 25% of the alcoholic beverages license fees collected from places of business in the County to the incorporated towns in which the places of business are located; requiring the Board of License Commissioners of Carroll County to develop and submit a plan to better enforce the prohibition against underage drinking to the Carroll County Board of County Commissioners, County Senators and County House Delegation on or before September 1, 2014.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page