Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Amprey, R. Lewis, Shetty, Solomon, and Toles
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring on or before certain dates each community college to develop and implement a plan to provide students with access to over-the-counter contraception; requiring each community college to submit a certain report to the Maryland Higher Education Commission by September 1 each year; requiring the Commission to submit a certain report to the General Assembly on or before October 1 each year; and authorizing the Maryland Department of Health, on request, to provide certain assistance to a community college.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-35)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {923622/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Contraception - Access Requirements
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (106-35) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-111 )
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page