Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities – Low–Income Housing – Energy Performance Targets
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, for the 2021-2023 program cycle, by regulation or order, to the extent that the Commission determines that low-income programs are available, to require the Department of Housing and Community Development to procure or provide for electricity customers energy efficiency and conservation programs and services designed to achieve a target annual incremental gross energy savings of at least 1% per year starting in 2022; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0462
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities – Low–Income Housing – Energy Performance Targets
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
(   7-211.1, 7-211.2 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2021 9:52 AM
Click to return on the top page