Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Otto
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salaries of the Sheriff of Somerset County, the State's Attorney for Somerset County, the County Commissioners of Somerset County, the President of the County Commissioners of Somerset County, members of the County Roads Board of Somerset County, and the President of the County Roads Board of Somerset County and the salaries and daily allowance for certain expenses of the Chief Judge of the Orphans' Court for Somerset County and associate judges of the Orphans' Court for Somerset County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0439
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-101, 9-104 )
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page