Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Acevero, Barve, Carr, Charkoudian, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Krimm, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to study and make recommendations on the feasibility of establishing a point-to-point commuter bus route that serves certain population centers along the I-270 corridor and provides service to and from job centers in Northern Virginia; requiring the Department, in conducting the study, to consult with certain governments, stakeholders, and entities and to study and make recommendations to the Governor and certain Committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {420619/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {420619/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page